EP3414112 - TYRE FOR VEHICLE WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 20126 Milano / IT | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAFORIO, Stefano c/o Pirelli Industrial S.r.l. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 I-20126 Milano / IT | 02 /
CASTELLINI, Alessandro c/o Pirelli Industrial S.r.l. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 I-20126 Milano / IT | 03 /
MONTANARO, Fabio c/o Pirelli Industrial S.r.l. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 I-20126 Milano / IT | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/51] | 01 /
CAFORIO, Stefano c/o Pirelli Industrial S.r.l. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 25 I-20126 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
CASTELLINI, Alessandro c/o Pirelli Industrial S.r.l. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 25 I-20126 Milano / IT | |||
03 /
MONTANARO, Fabio c/o Pirelli Industrial S.r.l. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 25 I-20126 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Porta & Consulenti Associati S.p.A. Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | [2020/05] |
Former [2018/51] | Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17706594.3 | 08.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017IB50684 | Priority number, date | IT2016UB00577 | 09.02.2016 Original published format: IT UB20160577 | [2018/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137903 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414112 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414112 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/12 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
B60C11/1218 (EP,US);
B60C11/1236 (EP,US);
B60C11/1281 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1213 (EP,US);
B60C2200/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN FÜR FAHRZEUGRÄDER | [2018/51] | English: | TYRE FOR VEHICLE WHEELS | [2018/51] | French: | PNEU POUR ROUES DE VÉHICULE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 05.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2017 | AL | 29.01.2020 | AT | 29.01.2020 | CY | 29.01.2020 | CZ | 29.01.2020 | DK | 29.01.2020 | EE | 29.01.2020 | ES | 29.01.2020 | FI | 29.01.2020 | HR | 29.01.2020 | LT | 29.01.2020 | LV | 29.01.2020 | MC | 29.01.2020 | MK | 29.01.2020 | MT | 29.01.2020 | NL | 29.01.2020 | PL | 29.01.2020 | RO | 29.01.2020 | RS | 29.01.2020 | SE | 29.01.2020 | SI | 29.01.2020 | SK | 29.01.2020 | SM | 29.01.2020 | TR | 29.01.2020 | IE | 08.02.2020 | LU | 08.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 29.04.2020 | NO | 29.04.2020 | GR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 29.05.2020 | PT | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 29.01.2020 | ||
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 08.02.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 08.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
NO | 29.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2492117 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028]; figures 1-4; claim - *; | [A]WO2014001069 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-18* pages 6-7; figure 2; claim - * |