EP3424008 - SYSTEM FOR SUGGESTING A LIST OF ACTIONS TO A USER, AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUZONNET, Loris 43 rue de la Plaine 38160 Saint Marcellin / FR | 02 /
PELLETIER, Benoit 23 route du Crest 38960 Saint Etienne de Crossey / FR | 03 /
PETRETTO, Frank 47 chemin Champ de Loup 38410 Vaulnaveys le Bas / FR | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17707566.0 | 28.02.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017EP54659 | Priority number, date | FR20160051768 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1651768 | [2019/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017148955 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424008 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06, G07F9/02 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (US);
G06F16/435 (US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06V40/172 (US);
H04L67/125 (US);
H04L67/535 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM VORSCHLAGEN EINER LISTE VON AKTIONEN AN EINEN BENUTZER UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2019/02] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SUGGESTING A LIST OF ACTIONS TO A USER, AND RELATED METHOD | [2019/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUGGESTION D'UNE LISTE D'ACTIONS A UN UTILISATEUR ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 05.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2022 | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/39] | 20.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 16.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007150916 (BEGOLE JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] ** figure 3 *; | [I]US2013046637 (SLUTSKY BRADLEY A [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0121] * * figures 1-3,5,7,15A,15B *; | [A]US2014147018 (ARGUE STUART [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 2-8 *; | [I]EP2953082 (INTEL CORP [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US2011134026 |