EP3427089 - SCANNING DETECTOR AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABU ANTOUN, Chafic Lagerstrasse 2 9470 Buchs / CH | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17707569.4 | 01.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP54698 | Priority number, date | EP20160158912 | 07.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16158912 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153213 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427089 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3427089 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/10 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G01V3/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABTASTDETEKTOR UND KONTROLLVERFAHREN | [2022/04] | English: | SCANNING DETECTOR AND CONTROL METHOD | [2019/03] | French: | DÉTECTEUR À BALAYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2019/03] |
Former [2019/03] | SCANDETEKTOR UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 08.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5729143 (TAVERNETTI RUSSELL E [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figure 1a * [A] 1,4-14; | [XAY]EP1092988 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,4,5,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] * * figures 1-13 * [A] 6,8,11,13 [Y] 2,3,7,9,12,14; | [YA]EP1298457 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 9,14 * paragraph [0021] * [A] 1-8,10-13; | [A]WO2006037176 (ROBERTS KENNETH BRIAN [AU], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 28 ** page 15, line 10 - line 32 *; | [YA]US2010164512 (KISS MICHAEL [AT], et al) [Y] 7,12 * paragraph [0059] * [A] 1-6,8-11,13,14 | Examination | US2010186504 | by applicant | US7355410 |