EP3413930 - DISINFECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UAB "Airplus1 Lituanica" Silutes road 105B 95112 Klaipeda / LT | [2019/25] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states UAB "Airplus1 Lituanica" I. Kanto g. 15-2 Klaipeda / LT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAJAUSKIS, Saulius Zeigiu St.3 LT-92382 Kunkiai / LT | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Klimaitiene, Otilija AAA Law A. Gostauto 40B 03163 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Klimaitiene, Otilija AAA Law P.O.Box 33 A. Gostauto street 40B 03163 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 17707664.3 | 25.01.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017IB50374 | Priority number, date | GB20160002191 | 08.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201602191 | LT20160000082 | 13.07.2016 Original published format: LT 2016082 | LT20160000086 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: LT 2016086 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137862 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413930 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, A61L2/24, A61L9/015, A61L11/00, B01D53/34 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A61L2/202 (EP,US);
A61L11/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
A61L9/015 (EP,US);
B01D53/46 (US);
B01D53/72 (EP);
B01D53/76 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP,US);
A61L2209/11 (EP,US);
B01D2251/104 (EP,US);
B01D2257/90 (EP);
B01D2257/91 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | DESINFEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2018/51] | English: | DISINFECTION SYSTEM | [2018/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉSINFECTION | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 31.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/39] | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005186108 (FIELDS WILLIAM MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,15 * claim - * * paragraphs [0028] , [ 0046] *; | [A]US2010061885 (HARLEY PHILLIP E [GB]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0052]; claim - *; | [X]EP2908867 (KJØLBY RES & DEV AS [DK]) [X] 1-15 * claim - * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] * * paragraph [0038] * | by applicant | LT5977 | US2015157753 | RU20160110902 |