EP3428635 - STRUCTURE EVALUATION SYSTEM AND STRUCTURE EVALUATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/03] | STRUCTURE ASSESSMENT SYSTEM, STRUCTURE ASSESSMENT DEVICE AND STRUCTURE ASSESSMENT METHOD | ||
[2024/40] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - German title | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - English title | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - French title | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATABE, Kazuo c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMINE, Hidefumi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
SHIOTANI, Tomoki c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2019/40] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
WATABE Kazuo c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAMINE Hidefumi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIOTANI Tomoki c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17707746.8 | 06.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017JP08850 | Priority number, date | JP20160098951 | 17.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016098951 | [2019/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017199544 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428635 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/14, G01N29/06, G01N29/07 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G01N29/14 (EP,CN,US);
G01M5/0008 (EP,US);
G01M5/0033 (EP,US);
G01M5/0066 (EP,US);
G01N29/043 (EP,US);
G01N29/07 (EP,US);
G01N29/2437 (EP,US);
G01N29/4436 (EP,US);
G01N29/4445 (EP,US);
G01N29/4463 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0232 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0258 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0289 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | STRUKTURBEURTEILUNGSSYSTEM UND STRUKTURBEURTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/40] | English: | STRUCTURE EVALUATION SYSTEM AND STRUCTURE EVALUATION METHOD | [2024/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE STRUCTURE | [2024/40] |
Former [2019/03] | STRUKTURBEURTEILUNGSSYSTEM, STRUKTURBEURTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STRUKTURBEURTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/03] | STRUCTURE ASSESSMENT SYSTEM, STRUCTURE ASSESSMENT DEVICE AND STRUCTURE ASSESSMENT METHOD | ||
Former [2019/03] | SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE STRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2017 | Translation filed | 09.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2017 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5293555 (ANTHONY MICHAEL [US]); | [YA]JPH09218182 (TOBISHIMA CONSTRUCT CO LTD); | [YA]CN102269736 ; | [YA]US2013118261 (STOTHERS IAN MCGREGOR [GB], et al); | [YA]JP2014095555 (TOBISHIMA CONSTRUCT CO LTD, et al) | International search | [A]US4531411 (COLLINS H DALE [US], et al) [A] 1-11* , column 4, line 31 to column 8, line 37 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JPH09218182 (TOBISHIMA CONSTRUCT CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4-11 * , paragraph [0011] (Family: none) * [A] 2-3; | [YA]JP2014095555 (TOBISHIMA CONSTRUCT CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1, 4-11 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0033] (Family: none) * [A] 2-3 | by applicant | JP2004125721 |