EP3426358 - APPARATUS FOR TRAINING, INVESTIGATING AND RE-EDUCATING NEURO-MUSCULAR FUNCTIONS IN A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robofit ApS Menggårdvej 21 6070 Christiansfeld / DK | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Claus, Nygaard Menggårdvej 21 6070 Christiansfeld / DK | 02 /
HELTZEN, Jesper Holmevej 29 8830 Tjele / DK | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Larsen & Birkeholm A/S Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17708251.8 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP54868 | Priority number, date | DK20160000148 | 10.03.2016 Original published format: DK 201600148 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153232 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426358 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/002, A63B21/005, A63B21/00, A63B24/00, A63B23/035 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A63B21/4043 (EP);
A63B21/00178 (EP);
A63B21/00181 (EP);
A63B21/002 (EP);
A63B21/0023 (EP);
A63B21/0058 (EP);
A63B21/153 (EP);
A63B23/0355 (EP);
A63B24/0087 (EP);
A61H1/0237 (EP);
A61H1/0274 (EP);
A61H2201/1215 (EP);
A61H2201/1635 (EP);
A61H2201/164 (EP);
A61H2201/50 (EP);
A61H2201/5035 (EP);
A61H2201/5061 (EP);
A61H2201/5064 (EP);
A61H2203/0406 (EP);
A61H2203/0425 (EP);
A61H2203/0456 (EP);
A63B2024/0093 (EP);
A63B2220/10 (EP);
A63B2220/17 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAINIEREN, UNTERSUCHEN UND UMSCHULEN NEUROMUSKULÄRER FUNKTIONEN BEI EINER PERSON | [2019/03] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TRAINING, INVESTIGATING AND RE-EDUCATING NEURO-MUSCULAR FUNCTIONS IN A SUBJECT | [2019/03] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRAÎNEMENT, D'ÉTUDE ET DE RÉ-ÉDUCATION DES FONCTIONS NEUROMUSCULAIRES CHEZ UN PATIENT | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2018 | Observations by third parties | 27.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 10.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 23.03.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4678184 (NEIGER HENRI J C [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,7,10 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,8,9; | [XI]US2014194251 (REICH ALTON [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0135]; figure - * [I] 2,6,8; | [I]EP0623367 (UNIVERSAL GYM EQUIPMENT INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2016059077 (PAUL SETH [US] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0036]; figure - *; | [XI]WO2014177787 (ERACLES TECHNOLOGY [FR]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 6, line 9 - line 25 * * page 10, lines 18-21; figure - * [I] 7; | [X]US5407403 (COLEMAN VERNON [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10 * column 4, line 43 - line 54; figure - * |