EP3427190 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MODULE WITH AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CHIP AND DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH A MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/03] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MODULE WITH AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CHIP AND DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH A MODULE | ||
[2023/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Thales Dis France SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTOBON, Stéphane Attn Intellectual Property Department 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 02 /
CHARLES, Luc Attn Intellectual Property Department 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 03 /
LAVIRON, Thierry Attn Intellectual Property Department 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | 04 /
DOSSETTO, Lucile Attn Intellectual Property Department 525 Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christine Marie Catherine Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/40] | Milharo, Emilien Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2019/03] | Milharo, Emilien Gemalto SA Département Propriété Intellectuelle 525, avenue du Pic de Bretagne 13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17708284.9 | 06.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP55218 | Priority number, date | EP20160305256 | 07.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16305256 | [2019/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153353 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427190 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3427190 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G06K19/07747 (EP);
G06K19/07752 (EP);
G06K19/07754 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES CHIPMODULS EINES INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTKREISES, UND VORRICHTUNG, DIE DIESES MODUL UMFASST | [2023/21] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MODULE WITH AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CHIP AND DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH A MODULE | [2023/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MODULE A PUCE DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE ET DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT UN TEL MODULE | [2019/03] |
Former [2019/03] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MODULS MIT EINEM IC-CHIP UND VORRICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINEM MODUL | ||
Former [2019/03] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MODULE WITH AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CHIP AND DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH A MODULE | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 08.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1039543 (MORGAN ADHESIVES CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0032] , [0036] , [0040] *; | [A]WO2009020852 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 3,4,9 ** paragraphs [0020] , [0025] , [0030] , [0035] *; | [XI]EP2811427 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,8,11-13 * figures 5A,5B,8 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0034] , [0036] , [0038] , [0043] , [0044] , [0048] * * claim 7 * [I] 2,3,6,7,9,10 | by applicant | EP0972268 |