EP3585559 - OPHTHALMIC LENS PROCESSING APPARATUS WITH IMPROVED USER ACCESSIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Optronics, Inc. 100 Avon Street Charlottesville, Virginia 22902 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEWEES, Robert Kenneth 353 Rolkin Road Charlottesville Virginia 22911 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Ralf Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 17709856.3 | 23.02.2017 | [2020/01] | WO2017US19090 | Priority number, date | US201715439393 | 22.02.2017 Original published format: US201715439393 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018156134 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585559 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/14, B24B13/00, B23Q1/66, B24B41/06, B24B41/02 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
B24B9/14 (EP,US);
B23Q1/66 (US);
B24B13/00 (EP,US);
B24B41/02 (EP,US);
B24B41/06 (EP,US);
G02C7/02 (US);
G02C2202/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | B24B9/14, B24B41/06, B23Q1/66, B24B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | BRILLENGLASBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTER BENUTZERZUGÄNGLICHKEIT | [2020/01] | English: | OPHTHALMIC LENS PROCESSING APPARATUS WITH IMPROVED USER ACCESSIBILITY | [2020/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LENTILLES OPHTALMIQUES PRÉSENTANT UNE ACCESSIBILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE POUR L'UTILISATEUR | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 14.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/20] | 09.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4191501 (SINKLIER ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 17,19-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE3921313 (BRIOT INT [FR]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US4908991 (LONGUET RAYNALD G M [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5165202 (SPINDEL JR GILBERT D [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001047348 (HOYA CORP) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [A]US2006286902 (COVARRUBIAS RICARDO [MX], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [XYI]US2015038061 (WALLENDORF STEFFEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13,15,16,18 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0010] , [ 0054] * * claims 1-24 * * Gas compression spring 66 * [Y] 17,19-21 [I] 8,14 | by applicant | US6203409 | US7029378 | US7198436 |