EP3427297 - LEAD-FRAME STRUCTURE, LEAD-FRAME, SURFACE MOUNT ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKS IP Association Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEOH, Din-Ghee c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BARTHELMES, Jürgen c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | MKS IP Association Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17709983.5 | 10.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP55726 | Priority number, date | EP20160159880 | 11.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16159880 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153590 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427297 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3427297 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, C23C18/42, C23C18/18, C25D3/46, H01L23/31, C23C18/54, C23C18/16, C25D5/48, C25D5/34, C25D5/02, H01L21/48, // H01L23/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
H01L23/49582 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1603 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1689 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/42 (EP,US);
C23C18/54 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/46 (EP,US);
C25D5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,US);
H01L21/4821 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/14 (US);
H01L23/3142 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/49541 (US);
H01L23/49575 (US);
C23C18/1614 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | H01L23/495, H01L21/48, C25D5/02, C25D5/34, C25D5/48, C23C18/16, C23C18/54, H01L23/31, C25D3/46, C23C18/18, C23C18/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITERRAHMENSTRUKTUR, LEITERRAHMEN, OBERFLÄCHENMONTIERTE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/03] | English: | LEAD-FRAME STRUCTURE, LEAD-FRAME, SURFACE MOUNT ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAME | [2019/03] | French: | STRUCTURE DE GRILLE DE CONNEXION, GRILLE DE CONNEXION, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/03] | STRUCTURE DE GRILLE DE CONNEXION, GRILLE DE CONNEXION, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE À MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 30.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2017 | AL | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | GB | 10.03.2021 | IE | 10.03.2021 | LU | 10.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.03.2017 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 10.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 10.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 10.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 10.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
GB | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4968397 (ASHER REGINALD K [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 3 - line 17 * * column 11, line 5 - line 38 ** claim 1 *; | [A]US2008216921 (KWAN YIU FAI [HK], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0031] *; | [AD]WO2010043291 (ATOTECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-14 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 21 * | by applicant | US5300158 | US5343073 | US5449951 | US6852427 | US2005121330 | EP1820884 | WO2010043291 | - CUI, "Adhesion Enhancement of Pd Plated Leadframes", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, (1999), page 837, XP000903859 |