EP3426392 - PREPARATION OF A CATALYTIC FABRIC FILTER WITH LOWER PRESSURE DROP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTELLINO, Francesco Rolighedsvej 31 3460 Birkerød / DK | 02 /
KOLLIN, Thomas Holten Abildvang 42 2700 Brønshøj / DK | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17710155.7 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP54880 | Priority number, date | DK20160000142 | 07.03.2016 Original published format: DK 201600142 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153236 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426392 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/847, B01J23/889, B01J23/22, B01J23/28, B01J23/30, B01J23/34, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, B01J23/648, B01J23/656, B01J23/72, B01J23/745, B01D53/94, B01J23/88, B01J23/881, B01J23/885, B01J23/887, B01J23/888, B01J23/89, B01J35/02, B01J35/06 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
B01J35/59 (EP,US);
B01D39/086 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/2017 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/02 (US);
B01D53/8631 (US);
B01D53/8653 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/8668 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/9431 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J23/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/28 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/34 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/6482 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/6562 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B01J23/8472 (EP,US);
B01J23/88 (EP,US);
B01J23/881 (EP,US);
B01J23/885 (EP,US);
B01J23/8877 (EP,US);
B01J23/888 (EP,US);
B01J23/8885 (EP,US);
B01J23/8892 (EP,US);
B01J23/8898 (EP,US);
B01J23/8906 (EP,US);
B01J23/8926 (EP,US);
B01J23/898 (EP,US);
B01J23/8986 (EP,US);
B01J23/8993 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/06 (US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/58 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
B01J37/0211 (EP,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,US);
B01J37/0242 (US);
B01D2239/0208 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0492 (EP,US);
B01D2239/06 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20769 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2255/915 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,US);
B01D2257/93 (EP,US);
B01J23/745 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYTISCHEN GEWEBEFILTERS MIT NIEDRIGEREM DRUCKVERLUST | [2019/03] | English: | PREPARATION OF A CATALYTIC FABRIC FILTER WITH LOWER PRESSURE DROP | [2019/03] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'UN FILTRE EN TEXTILE CATALYTIQUE AVEC DIMINUTION DE PRESSION INFÉRIEURE | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 03.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5051391 (TOMISAWA SHIGECHIKA [JP], et al); | [XI]US5843390 (PLINKE MARC [US], et al); | [XI]US6331351 (WATERS MICHELLE [US], et al); | [A]US2011082028 (NOCHI KATSUMI [JP], et al); | [XPA]WO2016058713 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) |