EP3423485 - MUTANT PORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Nanopore Technologies plc Gosling Building Edmund Halley Road Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4DQ / GB | [2021/50] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Oxford Nanopore Technologies Limited Edmund Cartwright House 4 Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford Science Park Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4GA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYASINGHE, Lakmal Oxford Nanopore Technologies Limited Edmund Cartwright House 4 Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford Science Park Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4GA / GB | 02 /
WALLACE, Elizabeth Jayne Oxford Nanopore Technologies Limited Edmund Cartwright House 4 Robert Robinson Avenue Oxford Science Park Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 4GA / GB | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2021/52] |
Former [2019/02] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17710371.0 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017GB50569 | Priority number, date | GB20160003656 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603656 | GB20160003657 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603657 | GB20160003658 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603658 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149316 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423485 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423485 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, C12Q1/68, G01N33/483 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/245 (CN,KR,US);
G01N33/48721 (CN,KR,US);
C12Q2565/631 (KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/631 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTANTE PORE | [2019/02] | English: | MUTANT PORE | [2019/02] | French: | PORE MUTANT | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 19.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21209304.1 / EP4019543 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2017 | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SE | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | LU | 02.03.2022 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.03.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.03.2017 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2013153359 (OXFORD NANOPORE TECH LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US5576204 | WO0028312 | WO2005124888 | WO2006100484 | WO2008102120 | WO2008102121 | WO2009020682 | WO2009035647 | WO2009077734 | WO2010004273 | WO2010004265 | WO2010086603 | WO2010086602 | WO2010122293 | WO2011067559 | WO2012005857 | WO2013041878 | WO2013057495 | WO2013098562 | WO2013098561 | WO2013121224 | EP2682460 | WO2014013260 | WO2014013259 | WO2014013262 | WO2013GB52766 | WO2013GB52767 | WO2014GB50175 | GB20140003096 | GB20140006147 | GB20140006155 | WO2014GB52505 | WO2014GB52736 | GB20140018469 |