EP3429665 - DOSING MECHANISM FOR MULTI-SHOT INJECTION DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE RATCHET ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 46 avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/52] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Sanofi 54 Rue de la Boetie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLOCH, Markus c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt / DE | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Christian ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 17710553.3 | 15.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017EP56139 | Priority number, date | EP20160305275 | 15.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16305275 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017158033 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429665 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A61M5/3155 (EP,US);
A61M5/31593 (US);
A61M5/20 (EP,US);
A61M5/2033 (US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31583 (EP,US);
A61M5/31585 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | DOSIERMECHANISMUS FÜR MEHRFACH INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT FLEXIBLEM RATSCHENELEMENT | [2024/28] | English: | DOSING MECHANISM FOR MULTI-SHOT INJECTION DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE RATCHET ELEMENT | [2019/04] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DOSAGE POUR DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION MULTIDOSE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT À CLIQUET FLEXIBLE | [2024/29] |
Former [2019/04] | DOSIERMECHANISMUS FÜR MEHRSCHUSS-INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT FLEXIBLEM RATSCHENELEMENT | ||
Former [2019/04] | MÉCANISME DE DOSAGE POUR DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION MULTI-INJECTION COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT CLIQUET SOUPLE | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 15.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2006229570 (LOVELL JOHN [US], et al); | [I]WO2012067582 (SHL GROUP AB [SE], et al); | [I]WO2014187812 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [A]WO2015007821 (SANOFI SA [FR]) |