EP3375061 - TRIPLE INPUT SMART POWER SUPPLY (TRISP) FOR DESKTOP PC AND OTHER SYSTEMS USING DC AS FINAL POWER SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indian Space Research Organisation Department of Space Antariksh Bhavan New BEL Road Bangalore 560231 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Indian Space Research Organisation Of Department of Space Antarikan Bhavan New Bel Road Bangalore, Karnataka 560094 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SABOO, T of C/O VSSC ISRO Government of India Department of Space Thiruvananthapuram Kerala 695022 / IN | 02 /
PRATHAP, V S of C/O VSSC ISRO Government of India Department of Space Thiruvananthapuram Kerala 695022 / IN | 03 /
SIBU, M S of C/O VSSC ISRO Government of India Department of Space Thiruvananthapuram Kerala 695022 / IN | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17710797.6 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/38] | WO2017IB50729 | Priority number, date | IN201641004989 | 12.02.2016 Original published format: IN201641004989 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137932 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375061 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/12, H02M1/10, H02J7/35, H02J9/06 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
H02J1/12 (EP,US);
G06F1/189 (US);
G06F1/263 (US);
G06F1/30 (US);
H02J3/38 (US);
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
H02J9/06 (EP,US);
H02M1/4208 (US);
H02S40/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE STROMVERSORGUNG MIT DREI EINGÄNGEN (TRISP) FÜR DESKTOP-PC UND ANDERE SYSTEME MIT VERWENDUNG VON GLEICHSTROM ALS ENDGÜLTIGE STROMQUELLE | [2018/38] | English: | TRIPLE INPUT SMART POWER SUPPLY (TRISP) FOR DESKTOP PC AND OTHER SYSTEMS USING DC AS FINAL POWER SOURCE | [2018/38] | French: | ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE INTELLIGENTE À ENTRÉE TRIPLE (TRISP) POUR ORDINATEUR DE BUREAU ET D'AUTRES SYSTÈMES UTILISANT LE COURANT CONTINU COMME SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION FINALE | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 12.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014060100 (BRYSON ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1-10,12-18 * figures 4,5,9 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] *[I] 11 |