EP3423672 - SEQUENTIAL FULLY IMPLICIT WELL MODEL WITH TRIDIAGONAL MATRIX STRUCTURE FOR RESERVOIR SIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue 31311 Dhahran / SA | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOGRU, Ali, H. Saudi Arabian Oil Company P.O. Box 1320 - SaudiAramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Williams, Michael David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17711453.5 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017US20318 | Priority number, date | US201615061572 | 04.03.2016 Original published format: US201615061572 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017151838 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423672 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B41/00, E21B49/00 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
E21B49/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | SEQUENTIELLES VOLLSTÄNDIG IMPLIZITES BOHRLOCHMODELL MIT TRIDIAGONALER MATRIXSTRUKTUR FÜR RESERVOIRSIMULATION | [2019/02] | English: | SEQUENTIAL FULLY IMPLICIT WELL MODEL WITH TRIDIAGONAL MATRIX STRUCTURE FOR RESERVOIR SIMULATION | [2019/02] | French: | MODÈLE DE PUITS SÉQUENTIEL ENTIÈREMENT IMPLICITE AVEC STRUCTURE DE MATRICE TRIDIAGONALE POUR SIMULATION DE RÉSERVOIR | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 06.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2458205 (LOGINED BV [NL]) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 13 * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 20 * * page 10, line 14 - line 27 *; | [A]US2009299714 (KELKAR MOHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] *; | [XI]US2012203518 (DOGRU ALI H [SA]) [X] 21,22,25-28,30-35,37,38 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0108] * [I] 1-19,23,24,29,36; | [A] - LARRY S.K. FUNG ET AL, "A Fully-Implicit Fully-Coupled Well Model for Parallel Mega-Cell Reservoir Simulation", SPE TECHNICAL SYMPOSIUM OF SAUDI ARABIA SECTION, (20050101), doi:10.2118/106331-MS, pages 14 - 16, XP055292573 [A] 1-38 * abstract * * Introduction * * Well Model Formulation * * Solution Method * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/106331-MS | by applicant | - CHEN; ZHANG, "Well Flow Models for Various Numerical Methods", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF NUMERICAL ANALYSIS AND MODELING, vol. 6, no. 3, pages 378 - 388 |