EP3432728 - ENZYME COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huvepharma Eood 5th Floor 3a Nikolay Haytov Street 1113 Sofia / BG | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUTCHKOUROV, Nikolay c/o Huvepharma EOOD 39 Petar Rakov Street 4550 Peshtera / BG | 02 /
PETKOV, Spas c/o Huvepharma EOOD 39 Petar Rakov Street 4550 Peshtera / BG | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17712127.4 | 20.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017EP56598 | Priority number, date | GB20160004750 | 21.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201604750 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162610 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432728 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23K20/189 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
A23K20/189 (EP,RU);
A23K20/10 (EP);
A23K20/111 (EP);
A23K40/10 (EP,RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | ENZYMZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2019/05] | English: | ENZYME COMPOSITIONS | [2019/05] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ENZYMATIQUES | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 19.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001288062 ; | [XY]US2003118472 (MCKEE MARY MOWREY [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,11,12 * example 1 * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]WO2014159185 (VERENIUM CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,13-15 * claims 6,8,12; tables 2,3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * [Y] 8-10; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 15, Database accession no. 2002-109670, XP002769703 & JP2001288062 A 20011016 (KOBAYASHI SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-3,6,7,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] * |