EP3427209 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USE IN TRANSFERRING FUNDS BETWEEN PAYMENT ACCOUNTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, New York 10577 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALHOTRA, Sandeep 26 Annjim Drive Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | 02 /
MADDOCKS, Ian David Alan 84 Tanfield Lane Broughton Milton, Keynes MK10 9NY / GB | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17712594.5 | 07.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017US21026 | Priority number, date | US201662306033P | 09.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662306033 P | US201615238000 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: US201615238000 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017155907 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427209 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/32, G06Q20/22, G06Q20/10 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/223 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3274 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEIM GELDTRANSFER ZWISCHEN ZAHLUNGSKONTEN | [2019/03] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USE IN TRANSFERRING FUNDS BETWEEN PAYMENT ACCOUNTS | [2019/03] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS LE TRANSFERT DE FONDS ENTRE DES COMPTES DE PAIEMENT | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 28.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014006184 (GODSEY SANDRA LYNN [US]) [I] 1-20 * abstract ** paragraphs [0037] - [0055] *; | [XI]US2014372308 (SHEETS JOHN [US]) [X] 1-11,14,16-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0032] , [0040] - [0068] * [I] 1-20 |