EP3423827 - BIOLOGICAL FLUID SEPARATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Qihua 223 Creststone Drive Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | 02 /
WEIDEMAIER, Kristin 4028 Westwood Place Raleigh, North Carolina 27613 / US | 03 /
BASCIANO, Christopher 2414 Bristers Spring Way Apex, North Carolina 27523 / US | 04 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Sivaramakrishnan 2320 Historic Cir Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | 05 /
DOWNIE, Patrick 1009 Charred Oak Circle Apex, North Carolina 27502 / US | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17713096.0 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017US20392 | Priority number, date | US201662302296P | 02.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662302296 P | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017151883 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3423827 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
B01D63/087 (EP);
B01D71/50 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D63/08 (EP,US);
B01D69/06 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (US);
A61M1/34 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2019/02] | English: | BIOLOGICAL FLUID SEPARATION DEVICE | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DE FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 01.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2014308167 (FLETCHER GARY D [US], et al); | [XI]US2014309556 (FLETCHER GARY D [US], et al); | [XA]US2014305196 (ELLIS ROBERT G [US], et al); |