EP3429594 - TRIAMCINOLONE ACETONIDE FORMULATIONS FOR JOINT PAIN IN DIABETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexion Therapeutics, Inc. 10 Mall Road Suite 301 Burlington, Massachusetts 01803 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODICK, Neil c/o Flexion Therapeutics Inc. 10 Mall Road Suite 301 Burlington Massachusetts 01803 / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17713558.9 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017US22277 | Priority number, date | US201662307879P | 14.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662307879 P | US201662323360P | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662323360 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017160818 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429594 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/58, A61K9/00, A61K9/16, A61K45/06 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | TRIAMCINOLONACETONID-FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR GELENKSCHMERZEN BEI DIABETIKERN | [2019/04] | English: | TRIAMCINOLONE ACETONIDE FORMULATIONS FOR JOINT PAIN IN DIABETICS | [2019/04] | French: | FORMULES D'ACÉTONIDE DE TRIAMCINOLONE POUR UNE DOULEUR ARTICULAIRE CHEZ LES DIABÉTIQUES | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 21.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/46] | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014153384 (FLEXION THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0129] * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2013019280 (FLEXION THERAPEUTICS [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0172] * * claims 1-28 * * examples 1-12 *; | [XP] - Anonymous, "Study to Assess the Effects of FX006 on Blood Glucose in Patients With OA of the Knee and Type 2 Diabetes - Full Text View - ClinicalTrials.gov", (20160503), URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT02762370?term=FX006&rank=3, (20170511), XP055371836 [XP] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - A. KUMAR ET AL, "Sustained efficacy of a single intra-articular dose of FX006 in a rat model of repeated localized knee arthritis", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE., GB, (20150101), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.joca.2014.09.019, ISSN 1063-4584, pages 151 - 160, XP055371887 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joca.2014.09.019 | [AD] - GEORGE S. HABIB ET AL, "The Effect of Intra-Articular Triamcinolone Preparations on Blood Glucose Levels in Diabetic Patients : A Controlled Study", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL RHEUMATOLOGY, US, (20110901), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1097/RHU.0b013e31822acd7c, ISSN 1076-1608, pages 302 - 305, XP055371879 [AD] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/RHU.0b013e31822acd7c | [A] - GEORGE S HABIB, "Systemic effects of intra-articular corticosteroids", CLINICAL RHEUMATOLOGY ; JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL LEAGUE OF ASSOCIATIONS FOR RHEUMATOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, LO, (20090228), vol. 28, no. 7, ISSN 1434-9949, pages 749 - 756, XP019663038 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2012019009 | US4293539 | WO9513799 | - HABIB GS; MIARI; WALI, JCR JOURNAL OF CLINICAL RHEUMATOLOGY, (201109), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 302 - 305 | - CREAMER P; HOCHBERG MC, "Osteoarthritis", LANCET, (1997), vol. 350, no. 906, pages 503 - 508 | - GOLDRING SR; GOLDRING MB, "Clinical aspects, pathology and pathophysiology of osteoarthritis", J MUSCULOSKELET NEURONAL INTERACT, (2006), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 376 - 378 | - HOCHBERG MC; ALTMAN RD; APRIL KT; BENKHALTI M; GUYATT G; MCGOWAN J; TOWHEED T; WELCH V; WELLS G; TUGWELL P, "American College of Rheumatology 2012 Recommendations for the Use of Nonpharmacologic and Pharmacologic Therapies in Osteoarthritis of the Hand, Hip, and Knee", ARTHRITIS CARE & RESEARCH, (2012), vol. 64, doi:doi:10.1002/acr.21596, pages 465 - 474, XP055282878 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/acr.21596 | - BENITO MJ; VEALE DJ; FITZGERALD O; VAN DEN BERG WB; BRESNIHAN B, "Synovial tissue inflammation in early and late osteoarthritis", ANN RHEUM DIS, (2005), vol. 64, pages 1263 - 1267 | - SELLAM J; BERENBAUM F, "The role of synovitis in pathophysiology and clinical symptoms of osteoarthritis", NATURE REVIEWS RHEUMATOLOGY, (2010), vol. 6, pages 625 - 635 | - WENHAM CYJ; CONAGHAN PG, "The role of synovitis in osteoarthritis", THER ADV MUSCULOSKEL DIS, (2010), vol. 2, pages 349 - 359 | - AYRAL X; PICKERING EH; WOODWORTH TG; MACKILLOP N; DOUGADOS M, "Synovitis: a potential predictive factor of structural progression of medial tibiofemoral knee osteoarthritis - results of a 1 year longitudinal arthroscopic study in 422 patients", OSTEOARTHRITIS CARTILAGE, (2005), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/j.joca.2005.01.005, pages 361 - 7, XP004885864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joca.2005.01.005 | - LOUATI ET AL., "Association between diabetes mellitus and osteoarthritis: systematic literature review and meta-analysis", RMD OPEN, (2015), vol. 1, no. 1, page E000077 | - HABIB ET AL., "Increased blood glucose levels following intra-articular injection of methylprednisolone acetate in controlled diabetic patients with symptomatic osteoarthritis of the knee", ANN RHEUM DIS, (2008), vol. 67, pages 1790 - 1791 | - HABIB GS., "Systemic effects of intra-articular corticosteroids", CLIN RHEUMATOL, (2009), vol. 28, pages 749 - 756, XP019663038 | - LOUATI K; VIDAL C; BERENBAUM F ET AL., "Association between diabetes mellitus and osteoarthritis: systematic literature review and meta-analysis", RMD OPEN, (2015), vol. 1, page E000077 | - BERENBAUM F., "Diabetes-induced osteoarthritis: from a new paradigm to a new phenotype", ANN RHEUM DIS, (2011), vol. 70, pages 1354 - 6 | - DERENDORF H; MOLLMANN H; GRUNER A; HAACK D; GYSELBY G, "Pharmacokinetics and pharmacodynamics of glucocorticoid suspensions after intra-articular administration", CLIN PHARMACOL THER, (1986), vol. 39, pages 313 - 31 | - BODICK N; LUFKIN J; WILLWERTH C; BLANKS R; INDERJEETH C; KUMAR A; CLAYMAN M, "TCA/PLGA microparticles prolong the residency of triamcinolone acetonide in the synovial tissues of patients with knee osteoarthritis", OSTEOARTHRITIS CARTILAGE, (2013), vol. 21, pages 144 - 5 | - BODICK N; LUFKIN J; WILLWERTH C; KUMAR A; BOLOGNESE J; SCHOONMAKER C; BALLAL R; HUNTER D; LAYMAN, M, "An Intra-Articular, Extended-Release Formulation of Triamcinolone Acetonide Prolongs and Amplifies Analgesic Effect in Patients with Osteoarthritis of the Knee, A Randomized Clinical Trial", J BONE JOINT SURG AM., (2015), vol. 97, pages 877 - 88 | - BODICK N; LUFKIN J; WILLWERTH C; BLANKS R; INDERJEETH C; KUMAR A; CLAYMAN M., "TCA/PLGA microparticles prolong the residency of triamcinolone acetonide in the synovial tissues of patients with knee osteoarthritis", OSTEOARTHRITIS CARTILAGE, (2013), vol. 21, pages 144 - 5 | - ALTMAN ET AL., "Development of criteria for the classification and reporting of osteoarthritis. Classification of osteoarthritis of the knee. Diagnostic and Therapeutic Criteria Committee of the American Rheumatism Association.", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1986), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 1039 - 49 | - DAMIANO ET AL., "A Comparative Effectiveness Analysis of Three Continuous Glucose Monitors: The Navigator, G4 Platinum, and Enlite", J DIABETES SCI TECHNOL, (2014), vol. 99, no. 5, pages 1701 - 1711 | - BUTTERFIELD ET AL., "Renal glucose threshold variations with age", BR MED J, (1967), vol. 4, no. 5578, pages 505 - 507 | - ESPOSITO ET AL., "Postprandial Hyperglycemia Study Group. Regression of carotid atherosclerosis by control of postprandial hyperglycemia in type 2 diabetes mellitus", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 214 - 219 | - KILPATRICK ET AL., "The effect of glucose variability on the risk of microvascular complications in type 1 diabetes", DIABETES CARE, (2006), vol. 29, pages 1486 - 1490 | - QU ET AL., "Rate of hypoglycemia in insulin-treated patients with type 2 diabetes can be predicted from glycemic variability data", DIABETES TECHNOL THER, (2012), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1008 - 1012 | - TESTA ET AL., "Comparative effectiveness of basal-bolus versus premix analog insulin on glycemic variability and patient-centered outcomes during insulin intensification in type 1 and type 2 diabetes: a randomized, controlled, crossover trial", J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2012), vol. 97, pages 3504 - 3514 | - WENTHOLT ET AL., "Glucose fluctuations and activation of oxidative stress in patients with type 1 diabetes", DIABETOLOGIA, (2008), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1007/s00125-007-0842-6, pages 183 - 190, XP019558682 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-007-0842-6 |