EP3436737 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING AN OUTER LAYER OF A PRESSURE VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/06] | PRESSURE VESSEL AND METHOD FOR FORMING AN OUTER LAYER OF A PRESSURE VESSEL | ||
[2021/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de la Fusée, 98-100 1130 Bruxelles / BE | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Advanced Innovation and Research Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERROT, Alice Rue Plantin 25 1070 Anderlecht / BE | 02 /
CRIEL, Bjorn Steenbergstraat 11A 1750 Sint-Martens-Lennik / BE | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17713686.8 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017EP57505 | Priority number, date | EP20160305374 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16305374 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017167858 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3436737 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/16, B29C70/32, B65H54/02, D04C3/40, B29C70/24, D04C1/06, F17C1/06 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B29C70/32 (EP);
D04C1/06 (EP);
D04C3/40 (EP);
F17C1/06 (EP);
B29C70/24 (EP);
D10B2505/02 (EP);
F17C2201/0104 (EP);
F17C2203/0607 (EP);
F17C2203/0621 (EP);
F17C2203/0663 (EP);
F17C2203/0665 (EP);
F17C2209/2154 (EP);
F17C2209/2163 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | F17C1/16, B29C70/32, B65H54/02, D04C3/40, B29C70/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AUSSENSCHICHT EINES DRUCKBEHÄLTERS | [2021/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING AN OUTER LAYER OF A PRESSURE VESSEL | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'UNE COUCHE EXTERNE D'UN RÉCIPIENT SOUS PRESSION | [2021/26] |
Former [2019/06] | DRUCKBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AUSSENSCHICHT EINES DRUCKBEHÄLTERS | ||
Former [2019/06] | PRESSURE VESSEL AND METHOD FOR FORMING AN OUTER LAYER OF A PRESSURE VESSEL | ||
Former [2019/06] | RÉCIPIENT SOUS PRESSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE COUCHE EXTERNE D'UN RÉCIPIENT SOUS PRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 16.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/21] | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5188872 (QUIGLEY PETER A [US]) [Y] 1-29 * figures 1, 4, 8 * * column 2, line 10 - line 31 * * column 3, line 24 - line 26 * * column 4, line 29 - line 33 * * column 4, line 49 - line 52 * * column 5, line 2 - line 4 * * column 5, line 50 - line 53 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 1 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 32 * * column 11, line 48 - line 55 *; | [Y]US2005260373 (DELAY THOMAS K [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]EP2033766 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [Y] 18-29 * figures 1, 15 * * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2011309074 (THUNHORST KRISTIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0080] *; | [A]US2012315569 (TANIGAWA MOTOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 18-29 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * |