EP3440458 - ULTRASONIC PROBE AND ULTRASONIC INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Dr. Foerster GmbH & Co. KG In Laisen 70 72766 Reutlingen / DE | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMEISSER, Michael Kärntener Straße 21 68753 Waghäusel / DE | 02 /
KRONENBITTER, Michael Hauptstraße 47 76855 Annweiler am Trifels / DE | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17714181.9 | 27.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017EP57227 | Priority number, date | DE201610205548 | 04.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016205548 | [2019/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017174391 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440458 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/22, G01N29/24, G01N29/27, B06B1/06, G10K11/00 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G01N29/04 (EP,KR,RU);
G01N29/221 (EP,KR);
G01N29/225 (EP,KR);
G01N29/2437 (EP,KR);
G01N29/27 (EP,KR);
B06B1/0607 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/023 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/044 (EP,KR);
G01N2291/105 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-PRÜFKOPF UND ULTRASCHALL-PRÜFANLAGE | [2019/07] | English: | ULTRASONIC PROBE AND ULTRASONIC INSPECTION SYSTEM | [2019/07] | French: | TÊTE DE TEST À ULTRASONS ET SYSTÈME DE TEST À ULTRASONS | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 15.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/41] | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]DE2421429 (KRAUTKRAEMER GMBH) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 6 [Y] 4 [I] 4,9,10; | [IDY]DE3442751 (MEURER GERHARD DIPL ING) [ID] 1,10 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-11 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 1; figures 1-2 *[Y] 4; | [XAYI]US2006048577 (HAQUE MD M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0096]; figures 7-8 * [A] 6 [Y] 4 [I] 5,9,10 | by applicant | DE3442751 | DE19533466 | DE19642072 | DE102008002859 | - A. WEBER ET AL., "Betriebliche Erfahrungen mit einer neuen Ganztafel-Ultraschallprüfanlage", DGZFP-JAHRESTAGUNG, (2013), pages 1 - 8 |