EP3424284 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME USING SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY AND AN ANISOTROPIC CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE USEFUL IN THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thin Film Electronics ASA Henrik Ibsens Gate 100 0255 Oslo / NO | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEL, Olle Westmansgatan 27 582 16 Linkoping / SE | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17714286.6 | 27.02.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017IB51112 | Priority number, date | US201662301243P | 29.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662301243 P | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149426 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424284 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/32, H01L21/60, C09J9/02, H05K13/04, H01L21/68, H05K1/18, H01L23/538, H01L25/16, H01L21/66, H01L21/67 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C09J9/02 (EP,US);
H05K3/323 (US);
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
C09J5/06 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K3/303 (US);
C09J2301/416 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27312 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2732 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2929 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29294 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29339 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29347 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29355 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2936 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29366 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29387 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2939 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29391 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29424 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29439 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29444 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29447 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29455 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29499 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75272 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75303 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75611 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75651 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75702 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75745 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75753 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75842 (EP,US);
H01L2224/759 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75901 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7598 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83005 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83132 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83851 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83862 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83874 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83907 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8391 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L2924/06 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10155 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10156 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15162 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09027 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10098 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10128 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F220/10 (US,EP);
H01L2224/27312, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0635 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0665 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/06, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29339, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29347, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29355, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29366, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2936, H01L2924/013 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29387, H01L2924/05432 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29387, H01L2924/05442 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2939, H01L2924/0615 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2939, H01L2924/063 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29424, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29439, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29444, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29447, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29455, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/75303, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/75745, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/759, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83203, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON MITTELS OBERFLÄCHENMONTAGETECHNIK UND ANISOTROPER LEITFÄHIGER KLEBSTOFF ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DEM VERFAHREN | [2019/02] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME USING SURFACE MOUNT TECHNOLOGY AND AN ANISOTROPIC CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE USEFUL IN THE METHOD | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION FAISANT APPEL À UNE TECHNOLOGIE DE MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET ADHÉSIF CONDUCTEUR ANISOTROPE UTILE DANS LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 27.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JPS6127902B (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [X] 1,5,14,15,18 * the whole document * [Y] 2 [I] 6,19; | [XYI]JPS62254455 (OSAKA SODA CO LTD) [X] 14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,6,18,19 [I] 1; | [A]EP1536372 (TRUEB AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,5,6,14,15,18,19 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY]WO2015062908 (MELECS EWS GMBH CO KG [AT]) [X] 1,14 * page 3, lines 8-37 * * page 4, lines 11-20 * * page 6, lines 8-27 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 2,5,6,18,19; | [XI]WO2015114863 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 14,15,18,19 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] * * figures 4-10, 14, 18-20, 22-24 * [I] 1,2,5,6 |