EP3440518 - REAL TIME MONITORING OF PRODUCT PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim RCV GmbH & Co KG Dr. Boehringer-Gasse 5-11 1121 Wien / AT | For all designated states SANDOZ GMBH Biochemiestrasse 10 6250 Kundl / AT | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGBAUER, Alois Muthgasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | 02 /
DÜRAUER, Astrid Muthgasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | 03 /
WALCH, Nicole Muthgasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | 04 /
SAUER, Dominik Muthgasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | 05 /
SCHARL-HIRSCH, Theresa Muthgasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | 06 /
MELCHER, Michael Peter Jordan Straße 82 1190 Wien / AT | 07 /
LEISCH, Friedrich Peter Jordan Straße 82 1190 Wien / AT | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17714807.9 | 04.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017EP57986 | Priority number, date | EP20160163713 | 04.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16163713 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017174580 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440518 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B17/02, G05B23/02 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G05B17/02 (EP,KR);
G05B19/056 (KR);
G05B19/0428 (US);
G01N21/6486 (EP,US);
G01N30/88 (US);
G05B19/106 (KR);
G05B19/4183 (US);
G05B19/41885 (US);
G05B23/0254 (EP,KR);
G16C20/50 (KR);
G01N2021/3595 (EP);
G01N2021/8416 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | ECHTZEITÜBERWACHUNG VON PRODUKTREINIGUNG | [2019/07] | English: | REAL TIME MONITORING OF PRODUCT PURIFICATION | [2019/07] | French: | SURVEILLANCE EN TEMPS RÉEL DE PURIFICATION DE PRODUIT | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 31.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008109090 (ESMAILI ALI [US], et al); | [X]US2009312851 (MISHRA SOUMITRA [US]); | [X]US2010191361 (MCCREADY CHRISTOPHER PETER [CA], et al) |