EP3433117 - HYDRAULIC SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLINGER, Nicolas 2 RUE DU CHATEAU 77720 BOMBON / FR | 02 /
GROULT, Antonin 129 RUE DU GENERAL DE GAUL 78740 VAUX SUR SEINE / FR | 03 /
GUINGAND, Frederic 8 PCE D'ANJOU 91430 IGNY / FR | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17715208.9 | 06.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017FR50489 | Priority number, date | FR20160052612 | 25.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1652612 | FR20160052613 | 25.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1652613 | [2019/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162951 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433117 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/02, B60G15/06, B60G11/54, F16F9/49, F16F9/58, F16F1/04, B60G17/08 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
B60G11/54 (EP);
B60G15/066 (EP);
B60G17/021 (EP);
B60G17/08 (EP);
F16F9/49 (EP);
F16F9/58 (EP);
B60G2202/12 (EP);
B60G2202/143 (EP);
B60G2206/41 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2019/05] | English: | HYDRAULIC SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2019/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUSPENSION HYDRAULIQUE D'UN VEHICULE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 24.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]JPS6264603 (SHOWA MFG) [I] 1,14 * abstract * [Y] 2-13; | [YA]FR2888780 (BIANCHI MAURO SA [FR]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 8, lines 3-21 * [A] 1,3-14; | [IY]JP2007146947 (SHOWA CORP) [I] 1,14 * abstract * [Y] 2-13; | [YA]FR2563882 (VOLZH OB PROIZVO [SU]) [Y] 10-13 * abstract * [A] 1,8,14; | [YA]JP2015135148 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 10-13 * figure - * [A] 1-9,14; | [YA]EP0864774 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 10-13 * abstract * [A] 1,14; | [YA]US3038560 (LONG JR PAUL J) [Y] 10-13 * figure . * [A] 1,14; | [A]JP2015163799 (SHOWA CORP) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2,4,7,8 *; | [A]JPH01295043 (SOQI INC, et al) [A] 1-14 * figure - *; | [A]JPH02283928 (ATSUGI UNISIA CORP) [A] 1-14 * figure - *; | [A]FR2995048 (SOBEN [FR]) [A] 1,3,6,14 * abstract *; | [A]US2014239567 (SUCHTA WOJCIECH E [CA], et al) [A] 1-9,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] *; | [A]EP0466628 (BIANCHI MAURO SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2995048 |