EP3432930 - INHIBITORS OF CDK12 AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/05] | INHIBITORS AND THEIR USES | ||
[2022/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Nottingham University Park Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG7 2RD / GB | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, Christopher James 41d Church Street Cropwell Bishop Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG12 3BY / GB | 02 /
BROOK, John David 25 Villiers Road West Bridgford Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG2 6FR / GB | 03 /
KETLEY, Ami Rosedene Main Street South Muskham Newark Nottinghamshire NG23 6EE / GB | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17715522.3 | 23.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017GB50824 | Priority number, date | GB20160005126 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201605126 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017163076 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432930 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3432930 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K45/06, A61K31/426, A61K31/454, A61K31/519, A61K31/7088, A61P21/00, A61K31/635 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/635 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/9121 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2814 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2835 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2892 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | A61K45/06, A61K31/426, A61K31/454, A61K31/506, A61K31/519, A61K31/7088, A61P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON CDK12 UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2022/18] | English: | INHIBITORS OF CDK12 AND THEIR USES | [2022/18] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CDK12 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/18] |
Former [2019/05] | INHIBITOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/05] | INHIBITORS AND THEIR USES | ||
Former [2019/05] | INHIBITEURS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 15.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | IT | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | IE | 23.03.2023 | LU | 23.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002119963 (SANNER MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-36,38-40 * paragraph 211; claims 50, 51 *; | [XA]WO03051886 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 38,39 * Examples 1, 7, 26, 28, 56, 60; biological data; claims 30, 31 * [A] 1-36,40; | [XA] - CHRISTIAN A. BÖSKEN ET AL, "The structure and substrate specificity of human Cdk12/Cyclin K", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140324), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms4505, XP055377119 [X] 38 * Fig. 6; p. 13, "Kinase inhibition assays" * [A] 1-36,39,40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms4505 | [A] - P. PAOLETTI ET AL, "Dopaminergic and Glutamatergic Signaling Crosstalk in Huntington's Disease Neurodegeneration: The Role of p25/Cyclin-Dependent Kinase 5", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, US, (20081001), vol. 28, no. 40, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.3237-08.2008, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 10090 - 10101, XP055377409 [A] 1-36,38-40 * p. 10096, chapter bridging left and right col.; Fig. 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.3237-08.2008 | Examination | - AMI KETLEY ET AL, "CDK12 inhibition reduces abnormalities in cells from patients with myotonic dystrophy and in a mouse model", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, US, (20200429), vol. 12, no. 541, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.aaz2415, ISSN 1946-6234, page eaaz2415, XP055703518 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.aaz2415 | by applicant | - LANGLOIS, M.A. ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY: THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, (2003), vol. 7, pages 670 - 680 | - WHEELER, T.M. ET AL., NATURE, vol. 488, pages 111 - 115 | - MULDERS, S.A. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2009), vol. 106, pages 13915 - 13920 | - WHEELER, T.M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 325, pages 336 - 339 | - KETLEY, A. ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2014), vol. 23, pages 1551 - 1562 | - DREWRY, D.H. ET AL., CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2014), vol. 14, pages 340 - 342 | - STEVENS, K.L. ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2008), vol. 18, pages 5758 - 5762 | - BANTSCHEFF, M. ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 25, pages 1035 - 1044 | - WERNER, T. ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2012), vol. 84, pages 7188 - 7194 | - KRUSE, U. ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2011), vol. 25, pages 89 - 100 | - BERGAMINI, G. ET AL., NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2012), vol. 8, pages 576 - 582 | - KO, T.K. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 114, pages 2591 - 2603 | - HAMSHERE, M.G. ET AL., PRO NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 7394 - 7399 | - BANTSCHEFF, M. ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2011), vol. 29, pages 255 - 265 | - SAVITSKI, M.M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, (2010), vol. 21, pages 1668 - 1679 | - SAVITSKI. M.M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (2013), vol. 12, pages 3586 - 3598 | - SAVITSKI, M.M., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 83, pages 8959 - 8967 |