EP3452325 - TANK SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A VOLUME-MODIFYING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Martin Soellnerweg 1 85399 Hallbergmoos / DE | 02 /
BRATER, Markus Milchstr. 1b 84163 Marklkofen / DE | 03 /
ARRAS, Emmanuel TrivaStraße 13 80637 München / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17716210.4 | 07.04.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017EP58333 | Priority number, date | DE201610207741 | 04.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016207741 | [2019/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017190912 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452325 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452325 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/03 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B60K15/03 (EP,US);
B60K15/03519 (US);
B60K2015/03085 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03368 (US);
B60K2015/03566 (US);
B60K2015/03576 (US);
B60S5/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TANKSYSTEM EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS MIT EINEM VOLUMENVERÄNDERUNGSELEMENT | [2019/11] | English: | TANK SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A VOLUME-MODIFYING ELEMENT | [2019/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSERVOIR D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE MUNI D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE MODIFICATION DU VOLUME | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 21.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5460135 (OHASHI TAMIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]DE102007014849 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [Y]DE102008046586 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [Y]US2011005609 (SUZUKI KEIJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2013075394 (SUZUKI KEIJI [JP]); | [YD]WO2016012284 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |