EP3436041 - SANITIZER COMPOSITION WITH PROBIOTIC/PREBIOTIC ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gojo Industries, Inc. 1 Gojo Plaza Suite 500 Akron, Ohio 44309 / US | [2023/21] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Gojo Industries, Inc. 1 Gojo Plaza Suite 500 Akron, Ohio 44309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANTZ, Sarah 2289 Woodpark Road Fairlawn OH 44333 / US | 02 /
COPELAND, Amanda 4922 Rolling Ridge Drive Seville OH 44273 / US | 03 /
ZAPKA, Carrie Anne 86 North Turner Road Austintown OH 44515 / US | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2019/06] | Tetzner, Michael, et al TETZNER & PARTNER mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17716757.4 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017US25324 | Priority number, date | US201662316332P | 31.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662316332 P | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017173241 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436041 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436041 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K9/06, A61P31/04 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,US);
A61K35/742 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR DESINFEKTION, ENTHALTEND EINEN PROBIOTISCHEN/PREBIOTISCHEN BESTANDTEIL | [2023/03] | English: | SANITIZER COMPOSITION WITH PROBIOTIC/PREBIOTIC ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2019/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DÉSINFECTANT CONTENANT UN PROBIOTIQUE/PRÉBIOTIQUE EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/06] | DESINFEKTIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PROBIOTISCHEM/PRÄBIOTISCHEM WIRKSTOFF | ||
Former [2019/06] | COMPOSITION DE DÉSINFECTANT COMPRENANT UN PRINCIPE ACTIF PROBIOTIQUE/PRÉBIOTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 04.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013122931 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]US2014364509 (WEGNER JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [Y]US2015044317 (FARMER SEAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2015093462 (YAROSH DANIEL B [US], et al) |