EP3433497 - ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR COMPRISING A BEARING PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 avenue des Béguines Immeuble le Delta 95800 Cergy Saint-Christophe / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes De Contrôle Moteur 14 avenue des Béguines Immeuble le Delta 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUFFINEAU, Julien c/o Valeo Systèmes De Contrôle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | 02 /
MARTIN, Nicolas c/o Valeo Systèmes De Contrôle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Chritophe / FR | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17716954.7 | 20.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017FR50641 | Priority number, date | FR20160052431 | 22.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1652431 | [2019/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162969 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433497 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/06, F04D29/059, F04D29/58, F04D29/42 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
F04D25/06 (EP);
F04D29/059 (EP);
F04D29/4206 (EP);
F04D29/5853 (EP);
F05D2240/15 (EP);
F05D2260/231 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER VERDICHTER MIT LAGERSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2019/05] | English: | ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR COMPRISING A BEARING PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2019/05] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE AVEC SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION DES ROULEMENTS | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 21.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/23] | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2924294 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] , [0022] , [0023] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 9; | [XI]FR1284111 (BRISTOL SIDDELEY ENGINES LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * page 2, colonne gauche, lignes 32 à 38 * * page 2, colonne droite, lignes 1 à 20 * * page 2, colonne droite, ligne 58 à page 3, colonne gauche, ligne 6 * * figures 1B, 2 * [I] 3,9,10; | [XI]DE20201118U (MISCEL OY LTD [FI]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 17 * * page 3, lines 11-13 * * figure 1A * [I] 9,10; | [XI]DE102015007379 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] - [0026] - [0035] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 9 |