EP3520429 - VERIFYING THE RENDERING OF VIDEO CONTENT AT CLIENT DEVICES USING TRUSTED PLATFORM MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODMAN, Oliver 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, Andrew 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/32] | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17717264.0 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US22256 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169515 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520429 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3520429 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8352, H04N21/254 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H04N21/8352 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0248 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0277 (EP,US);
H04L63/00 (US);
H04N21/23418 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/25816 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/4408 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | H04N21/8352, H04N21/258, H04N21/254, H04L29/06, H04N21/234, H04N21/442, H04N21/44, H04N21/4408, H04N21/658, G06Q30/02, H04N21/647 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER DARSTELLUNG VON VIDEOINHALTEN AUF CLIENT-VORRICHTUNGEN MIT SICHEREN PLATTFORMMODULEN | [2019/32] | English: | VERIFYING THE RENDERING OF VIDEO CONTENT AT CLIENT DEVICES USING TRUSTED PLATFORM MODULES | [2019/32] | French: | VÉRIFICATION DU RENDU D'UN CONTENU VIDÉO AU NIVEAU DE DISPOSITIFS CLIENTS À L'AIDE DE MODULES DE PLATEFORME DE CONFIANCE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 02.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23196683.9 / EP4266691 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011225422 (HWANG SUNG-OH [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]US2013103716 (YAMAGISHI YASUAKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 5-8 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] ** paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0087] *; | [Y]EP2868109 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1A, 2A-2B, 4C, 5B * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] *; | [Y]US2016381436 (YU LEI [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,3, 4 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075] * | Examination | US2007244820 | US2014282696 |