EP3433852 - DISPLAY WITH FUSED LEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X Display Company Technology Limited 6th Floor 2 Grand Canal Square Dublin D02 A342 / IE | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states X-Celeprint Limited Lee Maltings Dyke Parade Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEITL, Matthew c/o X-Celeprint Limited Lee Maltings Dyke Parade Cork / IE | 02 /
COK, Ronald S. c/o X-Celeprint Limited Lee Maltings Dyke Parade Cork / IE | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17717329.1 | 21.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017EP56628 | Priority number, date | US201662311288P | 21.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662311288 P | US201715438319 | 21.02.2017 Original published format: US201715438319 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162629 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433852 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/33, G09G3/32 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G09G3/32 (EP,US);
G09G3/3216 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
H01L27/0288 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0439 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (US);
G09G2330/045 (EP,US);
G09G2330/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | G09G3/3216, G09G3/3233, H01L27/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | LED ANZEIGE MIT SICHERUNGEN | [2024/31] | English: | DISPLAY WITH FUSED LEDS | [2019/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES AVEC DES FUSIBLES | [2024/31] |
Former [2019/05] | ANZEIGE MIT FUSIONIERTEN LEDS | ||
Former [2019/05] | AFFICHEUR AVEC LED PROTÉGÉES PAR FUSIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 08.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004183067 (STRIP DAVID R [US]); | [XI]WO2005078691 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) | by applicant | US5621555 | US6577367 | US7012382 | US7622367 | US8506867 | US8722458 | US8766970 | US8791474 | WO2014149864 | US8889485 | US9226361 | US2016057827 | US2016057822 | US2016057832 | US2016056725 |