EP3465548 - SEALING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF INSTALLING A SEALING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The European Atomic Energy Community (EURATOM), represented by the European Commission 200, rue de la Loi 1049 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states The European Atomic Energy Community (EURATOM), represented by the European Commission 200, rue de la Loi 1049 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGONZI, Claudio Via Passo Sentinella 121 21027 Ispra / IT | 02 /
PARNISARI, Marco Via Bolzano 5 21036 Gemonio / IT | 03 /
LITTMANN, François Contrada Bonè 13 21034 Cocquio Trevisago (VA) / IT | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17717436.4 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP59021 | Priority number, date | EP20160166702 | 22.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16166702 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017182398 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465548 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3465548 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G06K19/077, G06K19/07, G06K7/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G06K19/07372 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07737 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/10306 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/02 (RU);
G06K19/07 (RU);
G06K19/0717 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/077 (RU);
G06K19/07798 (EP,KR,US);
G08B13/24 (RU);
H04B1/7183 (RU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION EINES DICHTUNGSSYSTEMS | [2019/15] | English: | SEALING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF INSTALLING A SEALING SYSTEM | [2019/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2020/02] |
Former [2019/15] | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 20.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2017 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 03.06.2020 | |
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 03.06.2020 | |
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | NO | 03.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004239435 (HUGHES C DUFF [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0019] *; | [A]WO2005111961 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0026] , [0028] , [0049] , [0052] , [0054] , [0058] , [0067] *; | [Y]WO2014009981 (DATALOGIC SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraph [0071] * |