EP3427500 - PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING MEANS FOR EMITTING AN ALARM SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skygates S.R.L. Via Olivetti, 17 27020 Dorno (Pavia) / IT | For all designated states Cardillo, Paolo Giuseppe Via G. Motta 5 28015 Desenzano del Garda (BS) / IT | For all designated states Farina, Alessandro Via Acquedotto 49 20822 Seveso (MB) / IT | For all designated states Peloso, Martino Via Pier Paolo Pasolini 16 27010 Siziano (PV) / IT | For all designated states Corbetta, Mario Via Edison 15 20026 Novate Milanese (MI) / IT | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDILLO Paolo Giuseppe Via G. Motta, 5 28015 Desenzano Del Garda (BS) / IT | [2019/19] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
CARDILLO Paolo Giuseppe Via Edison 15 I-20026 Novate Milanese (MI) / IT | Representative(s) | Mozzanica, Luca Brevetti Dott. Ing. Digiovanni Schmiedt S.r.l. Via Aldrovandi, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Mocchetti, Ilio G. Brevetti Dott. Ing. DiGiovanni Schmiedt S.r.l. Via Aldrovandi, 7 (MM Lima) 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17717511.4 | 22.02.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017IT00033 | Priority number, date | IT2016UA01524 | 10.03.2016 Original published format: IT UA20161524 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017154030 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427500 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, G08B25/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G08B25/016 (EP,US);
H04W4/025 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (US);
H04M1/72457 (US);
H04W4/80 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT MITTEL ZUR AUSSENDUNG EINES ALARMSIGNALS | [2019/03] | English: | PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING MEANS FOR EMITTING AN ALARM SIGNAL | [2019/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTABLE COMPRENANT UN MOYEN D'ÉMISSION D'UN SIGNAL D'ALARME | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 25.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.08.2020 | 11.08.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2020 | 16.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/16] | 14.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008117253 (MATTEI SAULLE [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * pages 1-9 *[I] 3-10; | [XI]DE102013225325 (EOS SYSTEM MILAN VASIC UND JULIAN BESNARD GBR VERTRETUNGSBERECHTIGTE GESELLSCHAFTER MILAN VASIC [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0052] - [0 66] * [I] 3,5-10 |