EP3443606 - ELECTROLYTE FOR RECHARGEABLE ELECTROCHEMICAL BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/08] | ELECTROLYTE FOR RECHARGEABLE ELECTROCHEMICAL BATTERY CELLS | ||
[2023/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HPB Liquid Electrolyte UG (haftungsbeschränkt) Königswinterer Strasse 789 53227 Bonn / DE | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/08] | For all designated states FORTU NEW BATTERY TECHNOLOGY GMBH Schumannstrasse 61 53113 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMBITZER, Günther Schumannstr. 61 53113 Bonn / DE | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/41] |
Former [2019/08] | KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17717687.2 | 12.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017EP58820 | Priority number, date | DE201610106947 | 14.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016106947 | [2019/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017178543 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3443606 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3443606 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/485, H01M4/525, H01M4/58, H01M4/587, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0568, H01M4/38 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0563 (US);
C01F7/68 (US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYT FÜR WIEDERAUFLADBARE ELEKTROCHEMISCHE BATTERIEZELLEN | [2019/08] | English: | ELECTROLYTE FOR RECHARGEABLE ELECTROCHEMICAL BATTERIES | [2023/20] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE POUR BATTERIE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE RECHARGEABLE | [2023/20] |
Former [2019/08] | ELECTROLYTE FOR RECHARGEABLE ELECTROCHEMICAL BATTERY CELLS | ||
Former [2019/08] | ÉLECTROLYTE POUR ÉLÉMENTS DE BATTERIE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE RECHARGEABLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 25.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4362794 (ABRAHAM KUZHIKALAIL M) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-13 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 20; claims 1-5 * [I] 5,8,9; | [A]EP1923934 (FORTU INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AG [CH]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010283429 (OFER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * |