EP3436985 - SEMANTIC SEARCH SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR A DISTRIBUTED DATA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 26.08.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Boston ONE Campus 800 Federal Street Mail Stop: 1N Andover, MA 01810-1067 / US | For all designated states Nappey, Philippe Mollard Giroud 38700 Le Sappey En Chartreuse / FR | For all designated states Jacquet, Herve 791 Chemin Du Grannd Sorbier 38760 Saint Paul De Varces / FR | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAPPEY, Philippe Mollard Giroud 38700 Le Sappey En Chartreuse / FR | 02 /
JACQUET, Hervé 791 Chemin Du Grannd Sorbier 38760 Saint Paul De Varces / FR | 03 /
EL KAED, Charbel, Joseph Boston One Campus 800 Federal Street Mail Stop: 1N Andover, MA 01810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
NAPPEY, Philippe Mollard Giroud 38700 Le Sappey En Chartreuse / FR | ||
02 /
JACQUET, Hervé 791 Chemin Du Grannd Sorbier 38760 Saint Paul De Varces / FR | |||
03 /
EL KAED, Charbel, Joseph 381 Hanover Street, Apt. 4 Boston, MA 02113 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17718193.0 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017US25064 | Priority number, date | US201662316222P | 31.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662316222 P | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017173104 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436985 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04W4/00 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,CN);
G06F16/24522 (CN);
G06F16/243 (CN,US);
G06F16/24526 (EP,US);
G06F16/2458 (US);
G06F16/2471 (CN);
G06F16/27 (CN);
G06F16/284 (CN,US);
G06F16/367 (EP);
G06F16/9035 (US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06F9/3001 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | SEMANTISCHE SUCHSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN VERTEILTES DATENSYSTEM | [2019/06] | English: | SEMANTIC SEARCH SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR A DISTRIBUTED DATA SYSTEM | [2019/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RECHERCHE SÉMANTIQUE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE DONNÉES DISTRIBUÉ | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 28.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 26.04.2022 | Appeal received No. T2042/22 | 26.04.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.07.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011196852 (SRIKANTH MUNIRATHNAM [US], et al) [X] 1,17,33 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 2-16,18-32; | [A] - DATTA SOUMYA KANTI ET AL, "oneM2M Architecture Based User Centric IoT Application Development", 2015 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUTURE INTERNET OF THINGS AND CLOUD, IEEE, (20150824), doi:10.1109/FICLOUD.2015.7, pages 100 - 107, XP032798274 [A] 1-33 * page 102 - page 103 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FiCloud.2015.7 | [A] - LI HONGKUN ET AL, "Enabling Semantics in an M2M/IoT Service Delivery Platform", 2016 IEEE TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEMANTIC COMPUTING (ICSC), IEEE, (20160204), doi:10.1109/ICSC.2016.28, pages 206 - 213, XP032886254 [A] 1-33 * page 208 - page 210 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSC.2016.28 |