EP3448469 - PRESSURE SENSOR IN PLUNGER HEAD TO WAKE UP ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verily Life Sciences LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLEICHER, Brett 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
MIROV, Russell 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
KRASNOW, Benjamin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17718194.8 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US25085 | Priority number, date | US201662329605P | 29.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662329605 P | US201662431774P | 08.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662431774 P | US201715471358 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: US201715471358 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017189153 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448469 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/48 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/31511 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (US);
A61M5/172 (US);
A61M5/20 (US);
A61M5/31568 (US);
A61M5/486 (EP,US);
G01F23/296 (US);
G01K13/02 (US);
G01L19/0092 (US);
A61M2205/33 (EP,US);
A61M2205/332 (US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (US);
A61M2205/3569 (US);
A61M2205/3584 (US);
A61M2205/3592 (US);
A61M2205/50 (US);
A61M2205/52 (US);
A61M2205/581 (US);
A61M2205/8206 (US);
A61M2205/8212 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR IM KOLBEN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG DER ELEKTRONIK | [2021/11] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR IN PLUNGER HEAD TO WAKE UP ELECTRONICS | [2019/10] | French: | CAPTEURS DE PRESSION DANS LE PISTON POUR ACTIVER DE L'ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/10] | DRUCKSENSOR IN EINEM KOLBENKOPF ZUM AUFWECKEN VON ELEKTRONIK | ||
Former [2019/10] | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION DANS UNE TÊTE DE PISTON POUR ACTIVER UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 13.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5720733 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 4 - column 9; figure 4 *; | [XYI]WO2007024193 (MILLICORE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11-13,15,17,21 * page 5 - page 19; figures 4, 5 * [Y] 9,10,19,20 [I] 5,8,14,16,18; | [A]WO2010052275 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-21* p. 12/30; p. 29/30;; figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2013054165 (HOSPITECH RESPIRATION LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11-13,15,17,21 * page 5 - page 27; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3,4; | [A]WO2014145906 (PHD PREVENTATIVE HEALTH CARE AND DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0113]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2015165114 (GRANT KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,19,20 * Par. 0546-0551, 1078-1083, 1091;; figure 147 *; | [A]US2015289896 (GOMI MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0232]; figure 3 * |