EP3423524 - SALTS WITH ANTI-DEGRADATION ACTIVITY,ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS FOR TIRES AND TIRES COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/02] | SALTS WITH ANTI-DEGRADATION ACTIVITY, ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS FOR TIRES AND TIRES COMPRISING THE SAME | ||
[2019/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 20126 Milano / IT | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSSIELLO, Luigia c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 25 20126 Milan / IT | 02 /
HANEL, Thomas c/o Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 25 20126 Milan / IT | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/02] | Fraire, Cristina PGA S.p.A. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17718404.1 | 01.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017IB51197 | Priority number, date | IT2016UA01388 | 04.03.2016 Original published format: IT UA20161388 | [2019/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149472 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423524 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423524 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/18, C08L7/00, B60C1/00, C08K5/09, C08K5/17, C08K5/19, C08K5/00, C08K3/013 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,RU,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0025 (EP,RU,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025 (RU,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,RU,US);
C08K5/17 (RU,US);
C08K5/18 (EP,RU,US);
C08K5/19 (RU,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,RU,US);
B60C2200/04 (EP,US);
B60C2200/06 (EP,US);
B60C2200/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/09, C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/17, C08L9/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/18, C08L9/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2019/35] | C08L7/00, B60C1/00, C08K5/09, C08K5/17, C08K5/19, C08K5/00, C08K3/013 | ||
Former IPC [2019/02] | C08L7/00, B60C1/00, C08K5/09, C08K5/17, C08K5/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SALZE MIT ANTIDEGRADATIONSAKTIVITÄT, ELASTOMERE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR REIFEN UND REIFEN DAMIT | [2019/02] | English: | SALTS WITH ANTI-DEGRADATION ACTIVITY,ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS FOR TIRES AND TIRES COMPRISING THE SAME | [2019/35] | French: | SELS AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ ANTI-DÉGRADATION, COMPOSITIONS ÉLASTOMÈRES POUR PNEUS ET PNEUS COMPRENANT CELLES-CI | [2019/02] |
Former [2019/02] | SALTS WITH ANTI-DEGRADATION ACTIVITY, ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS FOR TIRES AND TIRES COMPRISING THE SAME | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 28.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2017 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.03.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB887173 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2424738 (PIRELLI [IT]) [A] 1-14 * examples 2-7; table 1 *; | [A]US2013102714 (RECKER CARLA [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * tables 1a-5a, *; | [A]EP2629987 (PIRELLI [IT]) [A] 1-14 * examples 2,3,6,10,; claims 1,2,8,9 *; | [A]WO2015001937 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-14 * examples 1-25 *; | [A]US2015344679 (BALNIS CRAIG R [US]) [A] 1-14 * examples B,C,D; tables 16-35 *; | EP3012291 [ ] (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) |