EP3445383 - IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST MELANOMA AND OTHER CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONNTAG, Annika Bohnenbergerstraße 9 72076 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | 03 /
MAHR, Andrea Kirschenweg 22 72076 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Eichhaldenstrasse 19 72074 Tübingen / DE | 05 /
FRITSCHE, Jens Lärchenweg 11 72144 Dusslingen / DE | 06 /
SINGH, Harpreet Heckscherstr. 25a 80804 München / DE | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17718508.9 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017EP59016 | Priority number, date | US201662325773P | 21.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662325773 P | GB20160006919 | 21.04.2016 Original published format: GB 201606919 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017182395 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3445383 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K39/00, C07K7/06, C12N5/0783 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K38/04 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K14/70539 (EA,KR,US);
A61K35/17 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P37/04 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07K14/7051 (EA,KR,US);
C07K16/2833 (EA,KR,US);
C07K7/08 (KR);
C12N15/115 (EA,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,EA,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EA,KR,US);
G01N33/574 (US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,EA,KR,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,EA,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/5158 (KR);
A61K2039/55511 (EA,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/55522 (EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/55588 (EA,KR,US);
C12N2310/16 (EA,KR,US);
C12N2502/11 (EA,KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EA,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | 21.09.2018 | ME | 21.09.2018 | Validation states | MA | 21.09.2018 | MD | 21.09.2018 | Title | German: | IMMUNTHERAPIE GEGEN MELANOME UND ANDERE KREBSARTEN | [2019/09] | English: | IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST MELANOMA AND OTHER CANCERS | [2019/09] | French: | IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE CONTRE LE MÉLANOME ET D'AUTRES CANCERS | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 21.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2020/15] | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/11] | 09.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0153312 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al); | [X]CA2343602 (GENSET SA [FR]); | [YD]EP1760088 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2007271630 (BOUKHAROV ANDREY A [US], et al); | [XY]US2008107668 (PHILIP RAMILA [US], et al); | [XY]US2011229504 (FRITSCHE JENS [DE], et al); | [X]WO2013151665 (MODERNA THERAPEUTICS [US]); | [Y]WO2015193359 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]); |