EP3472453 - DELIVERY PUMP FOR CRYOGENIC FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOTZ, Ingo Schubartstrasse 7 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
BREDOW, Falko Blumenweg 32 71691 Freiberg Am Neckar / DE | 03 /
SCHNITTGER, Dirk Baederwiesen 18/1 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | 04 /
ZEHNDER, Frank Nelkenweg 19 73770 Denkendorf / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17718927.1 | 24.04.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017EP59651 | Priority number, date | DE201610210737 | 16.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016210737 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017215820 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472453 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02M21/02, F04B1/04, F04B53/02, F04B53/14, F04B53/16, F17C3/02, F16L15/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
F02M21/0218 (EP);
F04B15/08 (EP);
F04B53/02 (EP);
F04B53/14 (EP);
F04B53/144 (EP);
F04B53/164 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | FÖRDERPUMPE FÜR KRYOGENE KRAFTSTOFFE | [2019/17] | English: | DELIVERY PUMP FOR CRYOGENIC FUELS | [2019/17] | French: | POMPE DE REFOULEMENT POUR COMBUSTIBLES CRYOGÉNIQUES | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 16.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US7293418 (NOBLE STEPHEN D [CA], et al) [YD] 1-10 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0285685 (BREINLICH RICHARD DR [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 18, line 30 - page 19, line 48; figure 23 *; | [A]EP1767783 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0053]; figures 2-5 *; | [A]CN102859192 (GRACO MINNESOTA INC) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4472946 (ZWICK EUGENE B [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 35; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | US7293418 |