EP3440369 - ELASTIC SHAFT COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hackforth GmbH Heerstrasse 66 44653 Herne / DE | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLINTROP, Joachim Heinestr. 67 47057 Duisburg / DE | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Schneiders & Behrendt Bochum Gerard-Mortier-Platz 6 44793 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Huestraße 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 17719167.3 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017EP57673 | Priority number, date | DE201610106365 | 07.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016106365 | [2019/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017174453 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440369 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3440369 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/74 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
F16D3/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELASTISCHE WELLENKUPPLUNG | [2019/07] | English: | ELASTIC SHAFT COUPLING | [2019/07] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT ÉLASTIQUE D'ARBRES | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 07.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 31.03.2017 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3938261 (HACKFORTH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0939238 (STROMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE202008012129U (KIRSCHEY CENTA ANTRIEBE [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP1413789 |