EP3449048 - AIR JET SPINNING MACHINE AND YARN SPINNING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/10] | AIR JET SPINNING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A YARN | ||
[2023/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Rieter AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANKENHORN, Peter Weimarer Strasse 9/1 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 02 /
GRIESSHAMMER, Christian Tegerlooweg 14 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17719720.9 | 18.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017IB52190 | Priority number, date | CH20160000568 | 29.04.2016 Original published format: CH 5682016 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017187293 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3449048 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/115 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
D01H1/115 (EP,US);
D01H4/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | LUFTSPINNMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GARNS | [2019/10] | English: | AIR JET SPINNING MACHINE AND YARN SPINNING PROCESS | [2023/17] | French: | MÉTIER À FILER DU TYPE VORTEX ET PROCÉDÉ DE FILAGE | [2023/17] |
Former [2019/10] | AIR JET SPINNING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A YARN | ||
Former [2019/10] | MÉTIER À FILER À JET D'AIR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FIL | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 09.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2008297688 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [Y] 6-9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] ** figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2014041412 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [Y] 2 * page 12, line 15 - line 30 * * figures 5,8 *; | [XY] - ZEGUANG PEI ET AL, "Study on the Principle of Yarn Formation of Murata Vortex Spinning Using Numerical Simulation", TEXTILE RESEARCH JOURNAL, GB, (2009), vol. 79, no. 14, doi:10.1177/0040517509102227, ISSN 0040-5175, pages 1274 - 1280, XP055390395 [X] 1,10-12 * Conclusion;; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3,6-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0040517509102227 | [Y] - LEILEI SUN ET AL, "Effects of structural parameters on the tangentially injected swirling flow in concentric tubes with different lengths as a model of the vortex spinning nozzle", TEXTILE RESEARCH JOURNAL, GB, (20151005), vol. 86, no. 12, doi:10.1177/0040517515609255, ISSN 0040-5175, pages 1241 - 1258, XP055390398 [Y] 3 * page 3, column 2, line 17 - line 31 * * figures 1,2,5,8; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0040517515609255 |