EP3465173 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INSPECTING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syntegon Technology GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 130 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [2020/16] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Erich Ingersheimer Hauptstraße 10/1 74564 Crailsheim / DE | 02 /
NIELSEN, Henrik Moeller Tove Ditlevsensvej 27 4700 Naestved / DK | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17720087.0 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP59903 | Priority number, date | DE201610209722 | 02.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016209722 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017207175 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465173 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/90, G01N21/88 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G01N21/9027 (EP);
G01N2021/8825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION VON BEHÄLTNISSEN | [2019/15] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INSPECTING CONTAINERS | [2019/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4915237 (CHANG ROGER [US], et al) [A] 5* column 6, lines 51-66; figure 3 *; | [XI]WO9408230 (G F ELETTROIMPIANTI S N C [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12,14 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 5, lines 14-20 * * page 6, lines 1-5, 12-24 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 2 * * page 8, lines 2-16 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 3 * * page 9, lines 17-20 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 5,9,13,15; | [XI]JPH0792108 (KIRIN TECHNO SYST KK) [X] 1,3,9,10,12 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 2,6-8,11,15 |