EP3436133 - PORT, DISPENSING SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH A PORT, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sartorius Stedim FMT SAS Avenue de Jouques ZI Des Paluds 13400 Aubagne / FR | [2023/12] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Sartorius Stedim FMT SAS Avenue de Jouques ZI Des Paluds 13400 Aubagne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALLARES, Alain 13720 Belcodène / FR | 02 /
BARHOUMI, Ali Cité Elatik Rue docteur Zouhaier Essafi Mhamdia Ben Arous, BP 50 / TN | 03 /
MENIER, Marie-Christine 7 lotissement Chante Cigale Impasse Charré 13600 La Ciotat / FR | [2023/12] |
Former [2019/07] | 01 /
PALLARES, Alain 104 Chemin des Gorguettes 13701 La Bouilladisse / FR | ||
02 /
BARHOUMI, Ali Cité Elatik Rue docteur Zouhaier Essafi Mhamdia Ben Arous, BP 50 / TN | |||
03 /
MENIER, Marie-Christine 7 lotissement Chante Cigale Impasse Charré 13600 La Ciotat / FR | |||
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
PALLARES, Alain 6 impasse des Loches 13720 La Bouilladisse / FR | ||
02 /
BARHOUMI, Ali Cité Elatik Rue docteur Zouhaier Essafi Mhamdia Ben Arous, BP 50 / TN | |||
03 /
MENIER, Marie-Christine 7 lotissement Chante Cigale Impasse Charré 13600 La Ciotat / FR | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2023/12] |
Former [2019/06] | Derambure Conseil 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17720187.8 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017FR50729 | Priority number, date | FR20160052766 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1652766 | [2019/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017168097 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436133 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436133 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/14, A61J1/20, A61M39/00, A61M39/04 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A61M39/00 (EP,US);
A61J1/1406 (US);
A61J1/10 (US);
A61J1/1412 (US);
A61J1/1468 (US);
A61J1/1475 (EP,US);
A61J1/1481 (EP,US);
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61M39/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | A61M39/04, A61J1/10, A61J1/20, A61M39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖFFNUNG, ABGABESYSTEM MIT SOLCH EINER ÖFFNUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/06] | English: | PORT, DISPENSING SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH A PORT, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2019/06] | French: | PORT, SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION COMPRENANT UN TEL PORT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 18.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | IE | 30.03.2023 | LU | 30.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | GB | 22.06.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 30.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
GB | 22.06.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 30.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 30.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 30.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3030955 (GOSSETT FRED C, et al) [X] 1-4,11-15 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,6,7 *; | [X]GB928842 (ALLEN & HANBURYS LTD) [X] 1-5,11-15 * page 2, line 7 - line 81; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4303067 (CONNOLLY TERRY, et al) [X] 1,2,11-15 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]FR2665633 (TECHNOFLEX [FR]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 29 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]WO2015061711 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0124]; figures 1-37 *[I] 13-15 |