EP3454778 - ARRANGEMENT FOR STORING AND LOADING A SELF-EXPANDING STENT-LIKE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qvanteq AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUCKER, Arik Idastrasse 20 8003 Zürich / CH | 02 /
MÄDER, Armin, W. Säntisstrasse 23 8805 Richterswil / CH | 03 /
BUZZI, Stefano Stallikonerstrasse 50 8903 Birmensdorf / CH | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17721187.7 | 09.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017EP60998 | Priority number, date | CH20160000605 | 09.05.2016 Original published format: CH 6052016 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017194504 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454778 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F2/82, A61F2/95, A61F2/01 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/0095 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/01 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61F2/844 (KR);
A61F2/95 (KR);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG UND ZUM LADEN EINER SELBSTEXPANDIERENDEN STENTARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | [2019/12] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR STORING AND LOADING A SELF-EXPANDING STENT-LIKE DEVICE | [2019/12] | French: | AGENCEMENT PERMETTANT LE STOCKAGE ET LE CHARGEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TYPE STENT AUTO-DÉPLOYABLE | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 07.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2010252470 (RYAN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-14,17-20,24,26-28 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4-7 * [Y] 3-5,7,15,21-23,25 [I] 16,29,30; | [Y]US2015305867 (LIU JUN [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,7,22,23 * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0188]; figures 100-113 *; | [Y]US2007061008 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0047] - [0049] , [0050] , [0052] , [0053] , [0065]; figure - *; | [Y]WO03094788 (SALVIAC LTD [IE], et al) [Y] 21,25 * figures 46-60; claim 11 * | by applicant | WO2010000080 | US8834550 | EP2018138 | EP1117349 |