EP3452501 - MONOMERIC PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liverpool School of Tropical Medicine Pembroke Place Liverpool L3 5QA / GB | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLEASS, Richard c/o Liverpool School of Tropical Medicine Pembroke Place Liverpool Merseyside L3 5QA / GB | 02 /
BLUNDELL, Patricia c/o Liverpool School of Tropical Medicine Pembroke Place Liverpool Merseyside L3 5QA / GB | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17721819.5 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017GB51212 | Priority number, date | GB20160007979 | 06.05.2016 Original published format: GB 201607979 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017191439 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452501 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, A61K39/395, C07K14/435, C12N15/62 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K47/6811 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
C07K2317/30 (EP,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,US);
C07K2317/40 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | MONOMERE PROTEINE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/11] | English: | MONOMERIC PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF | [2019/11] | French: | PROTÉINES MONOMÈRES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 03.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0187982 (US HEALTH [US], et al); | [XI]WO2015132364 (UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL [BE]); | [XP]WO2017005767 (UCB BIOPHARMA SPRL [BE]); |