EP3439841 - MACHINE FOR CUTTING SLABS OF STONE OR STONE-LIKE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breton S.p.A. Via Garibaldi, 27 31030 Castello di Godego (TV) / IT | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONCELLI, Dario Via San Pancrazio 1 36061 Bassano del Grappa (VI) / IT | 02 /
CODEMO, Renzo Via Cavin dei Cavai 13 31011 Villa d'Asolo - Asolo (Treviso) / IT | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | Application number, filing date | 17721849.2 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017IB51855 | Priority number, date | IT2016UA02285 | 04.04.2016 Original published format: IT UA20162285 | [2019/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175102 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439841 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439841 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/04, B23D47/04 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B28D1/043 (EP,US);
B28D1/048 (EP,US);
B23D47/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON PLATTEN AUS STEIN ODER EINEM STEINARTIGEN MATERIAL | [2019/07] | English: | MACHINE FOR CUTTING SLABS OF STONE OR STONE-LIKE MATERIAL | [2019/07] | French: | MACHINE POUR LA COUPE DE DALLES EN MATÉRIAUX PIERREUX OU SIMILAIRES | [2020/47] |
Former [2019/07] | MACHINE SERVANT À DÉCOUPER DES DALLES DE PIERRE OU DE MATÉRIAU ANALOGUE À LA PIERRE | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 03.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2017 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | FR | 03.05.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GB | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.03.2017 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 31.03.2017 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 03.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29705698U (BLANKE BOHNE J PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010066519 (ANCORA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, lines -7 * * page 5, lines 10-16 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 1 * * page 8, lines 15-21 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 26 * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [Y]US2011283859 (CODEMO RENZO [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0083] , [0093] , [0094] , [0106] , [0117] * * figures 1,12,13 *; | [A]WO2011144270 (GMM S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 5-13 * * page 12, lines 11-14 * * page 14, lines 12-14 * * page 15, lines 12-17 * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]WO2014207723 (DONATONI MACCHINE S R L [IT]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0001] * * figures 1,2,11,12 * |