EP3439781 - LOW TEMPERATURE WET AIR OXIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lummus Technology LLC 5825 N. Sam Houston Pkwy. W., 600 Houston, TX 77086 / US | [2024/20] |
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMFER, Bryan J. R13765 Eagle Road Ringle Wisconsin 54471 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Eric W5165 Koth Road Tomahawk Wisconsin 54487 / US | 03 /
LARSON, Simon 8205 Wintergreen Road Wausau Wisconsin 54401 / US | 04 /
FELCH, Chad L. 1862 Mike Lane Kronenwetter Wisconsin 54455 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17722639.6 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017US30024 | Priority number, date | US201662336079P | 13.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662336079 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017196557 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439781 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/34 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B01J20/3416 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/34 (RU);
B01J20/3475 (EP,US);
B01J20/3483 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (RU);
C02F11/08 (EP,RU,US);
C02F1/74 (EP,US);
C02F2101/306 (EP,US);
C02F2101/32 (EP,US);
C02F2103/365 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | NASSLUFTOXIDATION BEI NIEDRIGER TEMPERATUR | [2019/07] | English: | LOW TEMPERATURE WET AIR OXIDATION | [2019/07] | French: | OXYDATION À AIR HUMIDE BASSE-TEMPÉRATURE | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 09.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US8501011 (FELCH CHAD L [US]) [XD] 1-17* column 4, lines 29-44 *; | [X]WO2016028987 (SIEMENS ENERGY INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, lines 5-30 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 9 * * page 8, lines 12-17 * * page 9, lines 19-23 * * page 10, lines 4-8 * * page 13, lines 23-25 * * example * * page 8, lines 22-25 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US8501011 | US2014061134 | US9090487 |