EP3458197 - SUCTION DEVICE HAVING A HOUSING WHICH ENCLOSES A PROCESS CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESTA Apparatebau GmbH & Co. KG Gotenstrasse 2-6 89250 Senden / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states ESTA Apparatebau GmbH & Co. KG Gotenstrasse 2-6 89250 Senden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAUB, Frederik Ritzisrieder Straße 24 89290 Buch / DE | 02 /
KRATER, Sebastian Ziegeleiweg 11 89195 Staig / DE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2019/13] | Meyer, Thorsten Meyer Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrer-Schultes-Weg 14 89077 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 17723253.5 | 10.04.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017DE100285 | Priority number, date | DE201610109380 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016109380 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198250 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458197 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458197 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B04C3/06, B04C3/00, B04C9/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
B01D46/2403 (EP,US);
B01D50/20 (EP,US);
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
B01D46/0046 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,RU,US);
B04C9/00 (RU,US);
B04C2003/003 (EP,US);
B04C2003/006 (US);
B04C2009/004 (EP,US);
B04C2009/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSAUGGERÄT MIT EINEM EINEN PROZESSRAUM UMSCHLIESSENDEN GEHÄUSE | [2019/13] | English: | SUCTION DEVICE HAVING A HOUSING WHICH ENCLOSES A PROCESS CHAMBER | [2019/13] | French: | APPAREIL D'ASPIRATION COMPRENANT UN BOÎTIER ENTOURANT UNE CHAMBRE DE TRAITEMENT | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 18.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 10.01.2024 | |
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 10.04.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 |