EP3448427 - RNA ENCODING AN ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CureVac SE Friedrich-Miescher-Straße 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states CureVac AG Friedrich-Miescher-Straße 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | ||
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states CureVac AG Paul-Ehrlich-Str. 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOTIN-MLECZEK, Mariola c/o IP Department CureVac AG Friedrich-Miescher-Str. 15 72706 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
HOERR, Ingmar c/o IP Department CureVac AG Friedrich-Miescher-Str. 15 72706 Tübingen / DE | [2020/41] |
Former [2019/12] | 01 /
FOTIN-MLECZEK, Mariola Chemnitzer Weg 10 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | ||
02 /
HOERR, Ingmar c/o IP Department CureVac AG Paul Ehrlich Str. 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | |||
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
FOTIN-MLECZEK, Mariola Chemnitzer Weg 10 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | ||
02 /
HOERR, Ingmar Hasenbergstr. 99 70176 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17723647.8 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017EP60226 | Priority number, date | WO2016EP59711 | 29.04.2016 Original published format: PCT/EP2016/059711 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017186928 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448427 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C12N15/85 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
A61K48/0066 (US);
C07K16/00 (EP);
C07K16/10 (EP,US);
C07K16/1018 (EP,US);
C07K16/1027 (EP,US);
C07K16/1045 (EP,US);
C07K16/1282 (US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | FÜR EINEN ANTIKÖRPER CODIERENDE RNS | [2019/10] | English: | RNA ENCODING AN ANTIBODY | [2019/10] | French: | ARN CODANT POUR UN ANTICORPS | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 23.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008083949 (CUREVAC GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]WO2013151671 (MODERNA THERAPEUTICS [US]); | by applicant | WO2013143700 |