EP3459326 - METHOD FOR COVERING AN ELECTRIC UNIT, AND ELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestr. 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEBRICHER, Lothar Saalburgstrasse 19B 61440 Oberursel / DE | 02 /
HUBER, Dietmar Wingertstraße 43c 63322 Rödermark / DE | 03 /
RAUKOPF, Svenja Höhenweg 33 35329 Gemünden Felda - Hainbach / DE | 04 /
SCHILLINGER, Jakob Lisztstraße 9 85080 Gaimersheim / DE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17723680.9 | 12.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP61505 | Priority number, date | DE201610208782 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016208782 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198573 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459326 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, G01D11/24, H01L23/31, H01L23/495, H05K3/00, H05K3/10 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H05K1/186 (EP);
G01D11/245 (EP);
G01P1/02 (EP);
H01L23/3107 (EP);
H01L23/3135 (EP);
H01L23/49531 (EP);
H01L23/552 (EP);
H01L24/00 (EP);
H05K3/0014 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM UMMANTELN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN EINHEIT UND ELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT | [2019/13] | English: | METHOD FOR COVERING AN ELECTRIC UNIT, AND ELECTRIC COMPONENT | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ENROBER UNE UNITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE ET COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011140262 (LEE LEE HAN MENG EUGENE [MY], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraph [0021]; figures 1, 3d-3f *; | [Y]EP2924814 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE US LLC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] *; | [I]WO2015162010 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 26 *; | [XI]WO2016005609 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,4,7-10,12,15 * abstract * * page 9, line 28 - page 11, line 9 * [I] 2,3,5,6,11,13,14; | [I]DE102014218711 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] , [0 43] - [0047] * |