EP3464023 - ELECTROMECHANICAL POWER STEERING SYSTEM HAVING A PIVOTABLE BEARING FOR A HELICAL GEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | ||
For all designated states Thyssenkrupp AG Thyssenkrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | ||
For all designated states Thyssenkrupp AG Thyssenkrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VONIER, Felix Montafonerstr. 49 6780 Schruns / AT | 02 /
KOHLER, Christian Rebenstrasse 4 8888 Heiligkreuz / CH | 03 /
LASS, Eugen Ächelistrasse 20 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17724030.6 | 17.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP61831 | Priority number, date | DE20161006156 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016006156 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202664 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464023 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464023 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, F16H25/24, F16H57/021, F16H1/16 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B62D5/0409 (EP,US);
F16H1/16 (EP,US);
F16H57/021 (US);
F16H2057/0213 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B62D5/04, F16H25/24, F16H57/021 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHE SERVOLENKUNG MIT SCHWENKBAREM LAGER FÜR EIN SCHRAUBRADGETRIEBE | [2019/15] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL POWER STEERING SYSTEM HAVING A PIVOTABLE BEARING FOR A HELICAL GEARING | [2019/15] | French: | DIRECTION ASSISTÉE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE À PALIER PIVOTANT POUR UN ENGRENAGE HÉLICOÏDAL | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2017 | AL | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | IE | 17.05.2021 | LU | 17.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.05.2017 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.05.2017 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2006111133 (FAVESS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,6,10,11 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; figure 10 * [I] 2,7,8,12; | [A]DE20221954U (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102008001878 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figure - *; | [A]DE102008056024 (SKF AB [SE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0055]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]JP2011157034 (JTEKT CORP) [X] 1,6,10,11 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033]; figure 3 * [I] 2,7,8,12; | [A]US2013025960 (HAMA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0053] - [0056]; figure 1 *; | [XI]JP2013208933 (SHOWA CORP) [X] 1,6,10,11 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figure - * [I] 2,7,8,12 |