EP3458505 - ORIENTED POLYLACTIC ACID POLYMER BASED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERRILL, William W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KALISH, Jeffrey P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
PERCHA, Pamela A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
DEHN, Derek J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
GIVOT, Bradley L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
KADOMA, Ignatius A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
WITTE, Andrew J. 190 Ryan Street 2 Madison, WI 53704 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2021/17] |
Former [2019/13] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17724467.0 | 04.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017US31043 | Priority number, date | US201662339432P | 20.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662339432 P | US201662352643P | 21.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662352643 P | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017200756 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458505 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458505 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L67/04, B32B27/22, B32B27/30, B32B27/36 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
B32B15/043 (EP);
B32B15/046 (EP);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/12 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B23/00 (EP);
B32B23/042 (EP);
B32B23/048 (EP);
B32B23/06 (EP);
B32B23/08 (EP);
B32B27/065 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/22 (EP,US);
B32B27/28 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B29/005 (EP);
B32B5/32 (EP);
B32B7/06 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/514 (EP,US);
B32B2307/516 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/582 (US);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2307/704 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2405/00 (EP);
B32B2553/00 (EP);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US);
C08J2429/14 (US);
C08J2431/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08K5/0016, C08L31/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORIENTIERTE FOLIE AUF POLYMILCHSÄUREPOLYMERBASIS | [2019/13] | English: | ORIENTED POLYLACTIC ACID POLYMER BASED FILM | [2019/13] | French: | FILM ORIENTÉ À BASE D'UN POLYMÈRE D'ACIDE LACTIQUE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 19.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2017 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | ES | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | IT | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | PL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | IE | 04.05.2021 | LU | 04.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | FR | 28.06.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | GB | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 04.05.2017 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 28.06.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GB | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101397394 ; | [XI]WO9204413 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 144, line 3 - page 145, line 25; figure 16; claims 73,84,93,51; table 14 * * page 24, line 20 - line 26 * * page 134, line 10 - line 15 * * semi-crystalline; page 108, line 13 - line 15 * * crystallinity upon slow cooling; page 90, line 35 - page 91, line 13 * * crystallinity depends on thermal history; page 95, line 20 - line 22 * [I] 11-31; | [E]WO2017105887 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [E] 1-9,21,29-31 * page 21, line 19 - line 32; claims 1,2,4,6,7,8,10,14,15 * * page 6, line 20 - line 35 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 3; table 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 39, Database accession no. 2009-H02235, XP002772788 & CN101397394 A 20090401 (DONGLI FIBRE RES INST CHINA CO LTD) [A] 1,26 * abstract * * claim 5 * | [A] - GAJRIA A M ET AL, "Miscibility and biodegradability of blends of poly(lactic acid) and poly(vinyl acetate)", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (19960101), vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0032-3861(96)82913-2, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 437 - 444, XP004065446 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(96)82913-2 | Examination | WO2017222824 |